Bobby chin yoke choong email
WebMar 31, 2024 · Published Date: 31 Mar 2024 Mr Benny Lim Siang Hoe has been appointed as Chairperson of the Housing & Development Board (HDB) with effect from 1 April 2024. Mr Lim will succeed Mr Bobby Chin Yoke Choong, who has served as Chairperson of HDB since 1 Oct 2016. 2.
Bobby chin yoke choong email
Did you know?
WebApr 19, 2024 · SEMBCORP Industries on Wednesday announced the retirement of its Audit Committee chairman Bobby Chin Yoke Choong, who will be replaced by Yap Chee Keong. Mr Chin opted not to submit himself for re-election at the company's 19th annual general meeting held on Wednesday. WebBobby Chin Yoke Choong Non-executive & Independent Director Appointed December 1, 2008 Mr Chin is an independent director. He chairs the board’s Audit Committee and is a member of the Risk Committee. Mr …
WebSep 28, 2024 · Chairman of the Board, Mr Bobby Chin Yoke Choong, who is also the Chairman of NTUC Fairprice Co-operative Ltd, has been re-appointed, along with six … WebDec 1, 2008 · BOBBY CHIN YOKE CHOONG Non-executive & Independent Director Appointed December 1, 2008 Mr Chin is an independent director. He chairs the board’s Audit Committee and is a member of the Risk Committee. Mr Chin was the managing partner of KPMG Singapore for 13 years until his retirement in 2005.
WebBOBBY CHIN YOKE CHOONG. Non-executive & Independent Director. Appointed December 1, 2008. Mr Chin chairs the Audit Committee and is a member of the board’s … WebJun 10, 2014 · Updated June 10, 2014. SINGAPORE — Temasek has announced three additions to its board, increasing the number to 13. Mr Robert Ng Chee Siong and Mr …
WebBobby Chin - updated dec2024 Bobby Chin Yoke Choong Bobby Chin was the Managing Partner of KPMG Singapore from 1992 until his retirement in September 2005. …
WebMr Bobby Chin Yoke Choong, Chairman of NTUC Fairprice Co-operative Ltd, has been re-appointed as Chairman, HDB. 5. Professor Lily Kong Lee Lee , President of … john thomas mcintyreWebApr 29, 2024 · Bobby Chin Yoke Choong. Age. 68. Country Of Principal Residence. Singapore. The Board's comments on this appointment (including rationale, selection … john thomas marlar 1836WebThe Minister for Finance has re-appointed Mr Bobby Chin Yoke Choong as the Board Chairman of the Singapore Totalisator Board ("Tote Board") for another year, with effect … john thomas md mount sinaiWebApr 1, 2024 · Yoke Choong Chin biography. Yoke Choong (Bobby) Chin, CPA, is Non-Executive Independent Director of Avjennings Ltd since October 18, 2005. Mr Chin is the … john thomas obituary ctWebSep 30, 2016 · Sep 30, 2016, 6:07 PM SGT SINGAPORE - Mr Bobby Chin Yoke Choong takes over as chairman of the Housing & Development Board (HDB) on Saturday (Oct … john thomas mott 1497WebBobby Chin is Chairman at Ntuc Fairprice Co-Operative. See Bobby Chin's compensation, career history, education, & memberships. john thomas miller obituaryWebHDB will move forward with confidence to overcome the challenges, and continue to deliver on our promise to provide affordable and quality homes that Singaporeans will cherish. Mr Bobby Chin Yoke Choong Chairman john thomas md